Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marc Pelchat

Auxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada

Titular Bishop of Lambaesis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1950 Born
19 Jun 197626.1Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
25 Oct 201666.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
25 Oct 201666.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
8 Dec 201666.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lambaesis

MicroData Summary for Marc Pelchat (VIAF: 52908009)
Bishop Marc Pelchat (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Québec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Samuel-du-Lac-Drolet, Archdiocese of Québec

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Québec.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Jan 2017