Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father René Guay

Bishop-Elect of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1950 Born
13 Jul 197524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
18 Nov 201767.2AppointedBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
2 Feb 201867.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for René Guay
Father René Guay (born ) Bishop-Elect of Chicoutimi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Thomas-Didyme, Diocese of Chicoutimi, Québec
Ordained BishopCathedral, Chicoutimi, Diocese of Chicoutimi, Québec

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Chicoutimi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2017
  • ob/c23: CB, 24 Nov 2017
  • ob: CB, 28 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 29 Nov 2017