Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Rivest

Bishop Emeritus of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1942 Born
14 May 196624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
27 Jun 199553.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
27 Jun 199553.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thubursicum
15 Aug 199553.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thubursicum
19 Jun 200462.1AppointedBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada
18 Nov 201775.5RetiredBishop of Chicoutimi, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for André Rivest
Bishop André Rivest (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Chicoutimi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRepentigny
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Basilica, Montréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chicoutimi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,580
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018