Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Edouard Cardinal Gagnon, P.S.S. †

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for the Family

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1918BornPort-Daniel, Canada
15 Aug 194022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
19 Feb 196951.0AppointedBishop of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada
25 Mar 196951.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada
3 May 197254.3ResignedBishop of Saint Paul in Alberta, Canada
11 Jan 197354.9AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Council for the Family
197455.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Family
7 Jul 198365.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iustiniana Prima
7 Jul 198365.4AppointedPro-President of the Pontifical Council for the Family
25 May 198567.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Elena fuori Porta Prenestina
25 May 198567.3Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 198567.3AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Family
8 Nov 199072.8ResignedPresident of the Pontifical Council for the Family
3 Jan 199172.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses
29 Jan 199678.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
Mar 200183.1ResignedPresident of the Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses
25 Aug 200789.6DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for the Family

MicroData Summary for Edouard Gagnon:
Edouard Cardinal Gagnon P.S.S. (born , died ) President Emeritus of Family

  • a priest for 67.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
  • a cardinal for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015