Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emile Joseph Legal, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Edmonton, Alberta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1849BornSaint-Jean-de-Boisseau, France
29 Jun 187424.7Ordained PriestPriest
1880²30.2ProfessedPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
29 Mar 189747.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint Albert, Alberta, Canada
29 Mar 189747.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pogla
17 Jun 189747.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pogla
3 Jun 190252.7SucceededBishop of Saint Albert, Alberta, Canada
30 Nov 191263.1AppointedArchbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
10 Mar 192070.4DiedArchbishop of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emile Joseph Legal:
Archbishop Emile Joseph Legal O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop of Edmonton

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 86, and Page 461
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013