Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Marie Leray, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati

Titular Bishop of Remesiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1854BornMontoir, France
1879¹24.9Ordained PriestPriest
1886¹31.9ProfessedPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
24 Jul 189743.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Remesiana
27 Jul 189743.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati, Pacific (Oceania)
26 Jun 189844.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Remesiana
1926¹71.9RetiredVicar Apostolic of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati, Pacific (Oceania)
17 Oct 192975.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}, Kiribati, Pacific (Oceania)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie Leray:
Bishop Joseph-Marie Leray M.S.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 480

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013