Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François-Augustin Delamare

Deceased

Archbishop of Auch, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1800Born
24 May 182322.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 185655.4SelectedBishop of Luçon, France
16 Jun 185655.7ConfirmedBishop of Luçon, France
20 Jul 185655.8Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
8 Mar 186160.4SelectedArchbishop of Auch, France
18 Mar 186160.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Auch, France
26 Jul 187170.8DiedArchbishop of Auch, France

MicroData Summary for François-Augustin Delamare (VIAF: 49216706)
Archbishop François-Augustin Delamare (born , died ) Archbishop of Auch

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValognes
Ordained BishopCathedral, Reims, Archdiocese of Reims

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 135, and Page 351
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017