Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Armand-Ignace-Anaclet Cardon de Garsignies

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons (-Laon), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1803Born
3 Nov 183330.8Ordained PriestPriest
26 Nov 184744.8SelectedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
17 Jan 184845.0ConfirmedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
25 Feb 184845.1Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
6 Dec 186057.8DiedBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France

MicroData Summary for Paul-Armand-Ignace-Anaclet Cardon de Garsignies (VIAF: 9840225)
Bishop Paul-Armand-Ignace-Anaclet Cardon de Garsignies (born , died ) Bishop of Soissons (-Laon)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLille
Ordained BishopCathedral, Soissons, Diocese of Soissons (-Laon)

  • a priest for 27.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 529
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1848, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017