Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-François de Simony

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Soissons (-Laon)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1770BornToulon
16 Jun 181039.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 182454.4SelectedBishop of Soissons, France
21 Mar 182554.6ConfirmedBishop of Soissons, France
24 Apr 182554.7Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons, France
31 May 184776.8RetiredBishop of Soissons (-Laon), France
24 Feb 184978.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Soissons (-Laon), France

MicroData Summary for Jules-François de Simony:
Bishop Jules-François de Simony (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Soissons (-Laon)

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 354

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013