Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe-Olympe Gerbet

Deceased

Bishop of Perpignan-Elne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1798BornPoligny
1 Jun 182224.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 185456.0SelectedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
7 Apr 185456.2ConfirmedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
29 Jun 185456.4Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
7 Aug 186466.5DiedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France

MicroData Summary for Philippe-Olympe Gerbet:
Bishop Philippe-Olympe Gerbet (born , died ) Bishop of Perpignan-Elne

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 258

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013