Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François-Augustin Galtier

Deceased

Bishop of Pamiers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1799Born
18 Dec 182425.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 185656.7SelectedBishop of Pamiers, France
16 Jun 185656.8ConfirmedBishop of Pamiers, France
10 Aug 185657.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers, France
29 Jun 185858.9DiedBishop of Pamiers, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-François-Augustin Galtier (VIAF: 308185022)
Bishop Jean-François-Augustin Galtier (born , died ) Bishop of Pamiers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrousse-le-Château
Ordained BishopS. Etienne, Cathedral, Toulouse, Archdiocese of Toulouse (-Narbonne)

  • a priest for 33.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017