Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul-Pierre-Yves Dalmais, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of N’Djaména


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1917BornLyon, France
30 Jul 194931.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
24 Dec 195740.0AppointedBishop of Fort-Lamy, Chad
13 Apr 195840.3Ordained BishopBishop of Fort-Lamy, Chad
22 Dec 196144.0AppointedArchbishop of Fort-Lamy, Chad
6 Mar 198062.2ResignedArchbishop of N’Djaména, Chad
22 Jul 199476.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of N’Djaména, Chad

MicroData Summary for Paul-Pierre-Yves Dalmais:
Archbishop Paul-Pierre-Yves Dalmais S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of N’Djaména

  • a priest for 45.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013