Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julius Joseph Willem Peeters, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Buéa, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1913Born
9 Jul 193825.3Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
4 Jun 196249.2AppointedBishop of Buéa, Cameroon
24 Aug 196249.5Ordained BishopBishop of Buéa, Cameroon
29 Jan 197359.9ResignedBishop of Buéa, Cameroon
23 Sep 200289.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Buéa, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Julius Joseph Willem Peeters
Bishop Julius Joseph Willem Peeters M.H.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Buéa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenlo

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 125
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018