Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Samuel Kleda

Archbishop of Douala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1959 BornGolompuy
9 Mar 198627.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Oct 200041.8AppointedBishop of Batouri, Cameroon
18 Feb 200142.1Ordained BishopBishop of Batouri, Cameroon
3 Nov 200748.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Douala, Cameroon
17 Nov 200950.9SucceededArchbishop of Douala, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Samuel Kleda:
Archbishop Samuel Kleda , Archbishop of Douala

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Douala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2007
  • s: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,912

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Apr 2014