Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antoine Ntalou

Archbishop Emeritus of Garoua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1940 BornBandounga
8 Feb 197029.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 198242.5AppointedBishop of Yagoua, Cameroon
13 Mar 198342.8Ordained BishopBishop of Yagoua, Cameroon
23 Jan 199251.7AppointedArchbishop of Garoua, Cameroon
22 Oct 201676.4RetiredArchbishop of Garoua, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Antoine Ntalou (VIAF: 15079123)
Archbishop Antoine Ntalou (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Garoua

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Garoua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 23 Oct 2016