Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joachim Kouraleyo Tarounga

Bishop of Moundou, Chad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1958² Born
18 Nov 198931.8Ordained PriestPriest of Doba, Chad
3 Jun 200446.4AppointedBishop of Moundou, Chad
12 Sep 200446.6Ordained BishopBishop of Moundou, Chad

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joachim Kouraleyo Tarounga
Bishop Joachim Kouraleyo Tarounga (born 1958) Bishop of Moundou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Moundou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,683

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017