Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Waïngue Bani

Bishop of Doba, Chad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1963 Born
8 Jul 199128.4Ordained PriestPriest of Doba, Chad
10 Dec 201653.8AppointedBishop of Doba, Chad
18 Feb 201754.0Ordained BishopBishop of Doba, Chad

MicroData Summary for Martin Waïngue Bani
Bishop Martin Waïngue Bani (born ) Bishop of Doba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLaï, Diocese of Lai
Ordained BishopIn front of, Cathedral, Doba, Diocese of Doba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Doba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2016
  • ob: CB, 28 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,335

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017