Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Nicolas Nadji Bab

Bishop-Elect of Lai, Chad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1969 Born
11 May 200232.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lai, Chad
Nov 2018²49.1AppointedAdministrator of Lai, Chad
14 Dec 201950.2AppointedBishop of Lai, Chad
23 Feb 202050.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lai, Chad

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Nadji Bab
Father Nicolas Nadji Bab (born ) Bishop-Elect of Lai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBéré
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lai, Diocese of Lai

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Lai.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2019
  • ob/c12: CB, 17 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 18 Jan 2020

Quantcast