Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philippe Abbo Chen

Vicar Apostolic of Mongo, Chad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1962 Born
17 May 199735.0Ordained PriestPriest
2001²38.6EnteredPriest of Priests of Notre Dame de Vie
14 Aug 200947.2Solemn VowsPriest of Priests of Notre Dame de Vie
14 Dec 202058.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mongo, Chad
27 Feb 202158.7Ordained BishopVicar Apostolic of Mongo, Chad

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philippe Abbo Chen
Bishop Philippe Abbo Chen (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Mongo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDadouar
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mongo, Vicariate Apostolic of Mongo

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Mongo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2020
  • ob: CB, 2 Feb 2021
  • ~ob: CB, 6 Feb 2021
  • ob/c23: CB, 27 Feb 2021
  • c4: CB, 28 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 16 Apr 2021

Quantcast