Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Russo, M.C.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Doba, Chad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1945Born
9 Sep 196924.6ProfessedMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
18 Mar 197025.1Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
6 Mar 198944.1AppointedBishop of Doba, Chad
21 May 198944.3Ordained BishopBishop of Doba, Chad
30 Jan 201469.0ResignedBishop of Doba, Chad
29 Mar 201974.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Doba, Chad

MicroData Summary for Michele Russo
Bishop Michele Russo M.C.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Doba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Giovanni Rotondo, Archdiocese of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Doba, Diocese of Doba
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,457
  • ob/c3+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2014
  • d: CB, 30 Mar 2019
  • loc: AM, 8 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Apr 2019

Quantcast