Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Vanbuel, S.D.B.

Bishop of Kaga-Bandoro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1940 BornZolder, Belgium
25 Aug 195918.7ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
19 Apr 196524.4Solemn ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
21 Sep 196726.8Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
16 Jul 200564.6AppointedBishop of Kaga-Bandoro, Central African Republic
28 Sep 200564.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kaga-Bandoro, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Albert Vanbuel:
Bishop Albert Vanbuel S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Kaga-Bandoro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kaga-Bandoro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,979

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013