Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zbigniew Tadeusz Kusy, O.F.M.

Bishop of Kaga-Bandoro, Central African Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1951 Born
30 Aug 197018.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
26 Aug 197422.7Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
15 Apr 197624.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
31 May 201462.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kaga-Bandoro, Central African Republic
15 Aug 201462.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Kaga-Bandoro, Central African Republic
27 Sep 201563.8SucceededBishop of Kaga-Bandoro, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Zbigniew Tadeusz Kusy (VIAF: 43147662971560551122)
Bishop Zbigniew Tadeusz Kusy O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Kaga-Bandoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCieszyn, Poland
Ordained PriestCathedral, Katowice, Diocese of Katowice, Poland
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de l’Immaculée Conception, Cathedral, Bangui, Archdiocese of Bangui

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kaga-Bandoro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2014
  • ob/c2+: CB, 26 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,264
  • s: Bollettino, 27 Sep 2015
  • op: CB, 30 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Nov 2018

Quantcast