Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dieudonné Cardinal Nzapalainga, C.S.Sp.

Archbishop of Bangui, Central African Republic

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Andrea della Valle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1967 Born
8 Sep 199326.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
6 Sep 199730.4Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
9 Aug 199831.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
26 May 200942.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bangui, Central African Republic
14 May 201245.1AppointedArchbishop of Bangui, Central African Republic
22 Jul 201245.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bangui, Central African Republic
29 Jul 201245.3InstalledArchbishop of Bangui, Central African Republic
19 Nov 201649.6Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 201649.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Andrea della Valle
18 Dec 201649.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Andrea della Valle

MicroData Summary for Dieudonné Nzapalainga
Dieudonné Cardinal Nzapalainga C.S.Sp. (born ) Archbishop of Bangui

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMbomou, Diocese of Bangassou
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame de l’Immaculée Conception, Cathedral, Bangui, Archdiocese of Bangui

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Bangui.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 May 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 14 May 2012
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2012
  • i: CB, 31 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,504
  • card: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2016
  • i: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2016
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 May 2017