Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mirosław Gucwa

Bishop of Bouar, Central African Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1963 Born
12 Jun 198824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
2 Dec 201754.0AppointedBishop of Bouar, Central African Republic
11 Feb 201854.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bouar, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Mirosław Gucwa (VIAF: 28149233300676510007)
Bishop Mirosław Gucwa (born ) Bishop of Bouar

EventPlace
Birth PlacePisarzowa, Diocese of Tarnów, Poland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bouar, Diocese of Bouar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bouar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Dec 2017
  • ob/c3: CB, 21 Dec 2017
  • c2+: CB, 7 Jan 2018
  • c23: CB, 11 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,673

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 26 Apr 2019

Quantcast