Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Jeż

Bishop of Tarnów


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1963 BornLimanowa
12 Jun 198825.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
20 Oct 200946.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
20 Oct 200946.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigillava
28 Nov 200946.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigillava
12 May 201249.0AppointedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
15 Jun 201249.1InstalledBishop of Tarnów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Jeż:
Bishop Andrzej Jeż (born ) Bishop of Tarnów

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tarnów.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Number 16,318
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 May 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 31 Mar 2014