Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wiktor Paweł Skworc

Archbishop of Katowice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1948 BornRuda Śląska
19 Apr 197324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
13 Dec 199749.6AppointedBishop of Tarnów, Poland
6 Jan 199849.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tarnów, Poland
29 Oct 201163.4AppointedArchbishop of Katowice, Poland
26 Nov 201163.5InstalledArchbishop of Katowice, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wiktor Paweł Skworc:
Archbishop Wiktor Paweł Skworc (born ) Archbishop of Katowice

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Katowice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ab: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,185

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 16 Dec 2014