Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marek Szkudło

Auxiliary Bishop of Katowice

Titular Bishop of Wigry


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1952 BornTychy
27 Feb 197724.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Katowice, Poland
23 Mar 197826.0Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
13 Dec 201462.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland
13 Dec 201462.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Wigry
6 Jan 201562.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Wigry

MicroData Summary for Marek Szkudło:
Bishop Marek Szkudło (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Katowice

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Katowice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2014
  • od/c01/ob: CB, 13 Dec 2014
  • c2+: CB, 15 Dec 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,348

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015