Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Herbert Bednorz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Katowice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1908BornGliwice
22 Jun 193223.8Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 195041.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Katowice, Poland
4 May 195041.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bulla Regia
24 Dec 195042.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bulla Regia
12 Nov 196759.1SucceededBishop of Katowice, Poland
3 Jun 198576.7RetiredBishop of Katowice, Poland
12 Apr 198980.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Katowice, Poland

MicroData Summary for Herbert Bednorz:
Bishop Herbert Bednorz (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Katowice

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1989, Page 304
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014