Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juliusz Bieniek

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland

Titular Bishop of Dascylium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1895Born
16 Jun 191823.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 193741.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland
13 Mar 193741.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Dascylium
25 Apr 193742.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dascylium
17 Jan 197882.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland

MicroData Summary for Juliusz Bieniek
Bishop Juliusz Bieniek (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Katowice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchoffschutz

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,937, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast