Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Benedykt Kurpas

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Katowice, Poland

Titular Bishop of Orisa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1912Born
20 Apr 193725.0Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
23 Nov 196250.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland
23 Nov 196250.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Orisa
24 Feb 196350.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Orisa
22 Jun 199179.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland
19 May 199280.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Katowice, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Benedykt Kurpas
Bishop Józef Benedykt Kurpas (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Katowice

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaniowy

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Apr 2017