Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Walenty Wieczorek

Bishop Emeritus of Gliwice, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1935 Born
22 Jun 195823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Opole, Poland
12 Jun 198146.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Opole, Poland
12 Jun 198146.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Thimida Regia
16 Aug 198146.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thimida Regia
25 Mar 199257.1AppointedBishop of Gliwice, Poland
29 Dec 201176.8RetiredBishop of Gliwice, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Walenty Wieczorek
Bishop Jan Walenty Wieczorek (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Gliwice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBodzanowice

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gliwice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,827
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast