Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Józef Piotr Kupny

Archbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1956 BornDabrówka Wielka
28 Feb 198226.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Katowice, Poland
31 Mar 198327.1Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
21 Dec 200549.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland
21 Dec 200549.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vanariona
4 Feb 200649.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vanariona
18 May 201357.2AppointedArchbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland
16 Jun 201357.3InstalledArchbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Piotr Kupny:
Archbishop Józef Piotr Kupny (born ) Archbishop of Wrocław {Breslavia}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Wrocław {Breslavia}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,053
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013