Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard Bernacki

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Katowice, Poland

Titular Bishop of Oppidum Consilinum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1942Born
4 Jun 196724.5Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
18 Mar 198845.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland
18 Mar 198845.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Oppidum Consilinum
16 Apr 198845.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oppidum Consilinum
31 Jan 201269.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland
21 Dec 201876.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Katowice, Poland

MicroData Summary for Gerard Bernacki
Bishop Gerard Bernacki (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Katowice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKsiazenice
Ordained BishopCathedral, Katowice, Diocese of Katowice
Death PlacePrudnik

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,553
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,245
  • d: CB, 22 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Dec 2018

Quantcast