Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanisław Gądecki

Archbishop of Poznań, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1949 Born
9 Jun 197323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
1 Feb 199242.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
1 Feb 199242.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rubicon
25 Mar 199242.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rubicon
28 Mar 200252.4AppointedArchbishop of Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Gądecki
Archbishop Stanisław Gądecki (born ) Archbishop of Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStrzelno

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Poznań.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,768
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast