Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Szymon Stułkowski

Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

Titular Bishop of Tabalta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1961 Born
15 May 198625.2Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
24 May 201958.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
24 May 201958.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tabalta
9 Jun 201958.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tabalta

MicroData Summary for Szymon Stułkowski
Bishop Szymon Stułkowski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRokietnica, Archdiocese of Poznań
Ordained BishopCathedral, Poznań, Archdiocese of Poznań

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Poznań.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 May 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 May 2019
  • c34: CB, 5 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 13 Jun 2019

Quantcast