Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Grzegorz Balcerek

Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

Titular Bishop of Selendeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1954 BornGrodzisk Wielkopolski
24 May 197925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
24 Apr 199945.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
24 Apr 199945.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Selendeta
13 May 199945.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Selendeta

MicroData Summary for Grzegorz Balcerek:
Bishop Grzegorz Balcerek (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Poznań.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,551

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013