Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zdzisław Fortuniak

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Poznań

Titular Bishop of Tamagrista


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1939 BornWieszczyczyn
26 May 196324.3Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
10 Apr 198243.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
10 Apr 198243.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tamagrista
9 May 198243.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tamagrista
25 Feb 201475.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Zdzisław Fortuniak:
Bishop Zdzisław Fortuniak (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Poznań

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Poznań.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 25 Feb 2014