Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeusz Etter

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

Titular Bishop of Bonitza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1911Born
17 Jun 193423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
22 Jul 195948.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
22 Jul 195948.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bonitza
25 Oct 195948.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bonitza
18 Dec 198473.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Etter
Bishop Tadeusz Etter (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoznan

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,959, Number 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast