Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Wojciech Polak

Archbishop of Gniezno, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1964 Born
13 May 198924.4Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
8 Apr 200338.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
8 Apr 200338.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mons in Numidia
4 May 200338.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mons in Numidia
17 May 201449.4AppointedArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland
7 Jun 201449.4InstalledArchbishop of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Wojciech Polak
Archbishop Wojciech Polak (born ) Archbishop of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInowrocław

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Gniezno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,373
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018