Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bogdan Józef Wojtuś

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gniezno, Poland

Titular Bishop of Vassinassa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1937Born
20 May 196123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
24 Sep 198851.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
24 Sep 198851.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Vassinassa
8 Oct 198851.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vassinassa
15 Sep 201275.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
20 Oct 202083.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Bogdan Józef Wojtuś
Bishop Bogdan Józef Wojtuś (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLasko Wielkie
Ordained BishopAssumption, Cathedral, Gniezno, Archdiocese of Gniezno
Death PlaceHospital, Poznań, Archdiocese of Poznań

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,566
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 20 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 21 Oct 2020

Quantcast