Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stanisław Budzik

Archbishop of Lublin, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1952 Born
29 May 197725.0Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
24 Feb 200451.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
24 Feb 200451.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Hólar
3 Apr 200451.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hólar
26 Sep 201159.4AppointedArchbishop of Lublin, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Budzik
Archbishop Stanisław Budzik (born ) Archbishop of Lublin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŁękawica

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lublin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,570
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Sep 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018