Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Artur Ważny

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Tarnów, Poland

Titular Bishop of Mazaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1966 Born
25 May 199124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
12 Dec 202054.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
12 Dec 202054.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mazaca
30 Jan 202154.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mazaca

MicroData Summary for Artur Ważny (VIAF: 102065158)
Father Artur Ważny (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Tarnów

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRzeszów
Ordained BishopNajświętszej Maryi Panny Królowej Polski, Church, Tarnów, Diocese of Tarnów

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Tarnów.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Dec 2020
  • ob: CB, 24 Dec 2020
  • c2+: CB, 14 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 15 Jan 2021

Quantcast