Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Wodarczyk

Auxiliary Bishop of Katowice

Titular Bishop of Pomezania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1968 BornTarnowskie Góry
14 May 199426.3Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
13 Dec 201446.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Katowice, Poland
13 Dec 201446.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Pomezania
6 Jan 201547.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pomezania

MicroData Summary for Adam Wodarczyk:
Bishop Adam Wodarczyk (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Katowice

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Katowice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Dec 2014
  • c1/ob: CB, 13 Dec 2014
  • c2+: CB, 15 Dec 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,349

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015