Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Iwanecki

Auxiliary Bishop of Gliwice, Poland

Titular Bishop of Arcavica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1960 Born
27 Mar 198625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Katowice, Poland
25 Mar 199231.3IncardinatedPriest of Gliwice, Poland
18 Nov 201757.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gliwice, Poland
18 Nov 201757.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcavica
7 Jan 201857.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcavica

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Iwanecki
Bishop Andrzej Iwanecki (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gliwice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiemianowice Śląskie, Diocese of Katowice
Ordained BishopCathedral, Gliwice, Diocese of Gliwice

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gliwice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2017
  • c2+: CB, 14 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,660

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast