Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Kopiec

Bishop of Gliwice, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1947 Born
30 Apr 197224.3Ordained PriestPriest of Opole, Poland
4 Dec 199244.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Opole, Poland
4 Dec 199244.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cemerinianus
6 Jan 199345.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cemerinianus
29 Dec 201164.0AppointedBishop of Gliwice, Poland
28 Jan 201264.1InstalledBishop of Gliwice, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Kopiec
Bishop Jan Kopiec (born ) Bishop of Gliwice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZabrze

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gliwice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,942
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast