Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paweł Stobrawa

Auxiliary Bishop of Opole, Poland

Titular Bishop of Aeca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1947 Born
20 May 197326.0Ordained PriestPriest of Opole, Poland
16 Apr 200355.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Opole, Poland
16 Apr 200355.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Aeca
14 May 200356.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aeca

MicroData Summary for Paweł Stobrawa
Bishop Paweł Stobrawa (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Opole

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZborowskie

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Opole.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,377

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018