Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Piotrowski

Bishop of Kielce


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1953 BornSzczurowa
25 May 198027.4Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
14 Dec 201360.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
14 Dec 201360.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinitis
25 Jan 201461.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinitis
11 Oct 201461.8AppointedBishop of Kielce, Poland
29 Nov 201461.9InstalledBishop of Kielce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Piotrowski:
Bishop Jan Piotrowski (born ) Bishop of Kielce

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kielce.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2013
  • c1: CB, 14 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,080
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 16 Oct 2014