Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Kaleta

Auxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland

Titular Bishop of Maxita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1957 Born
25 May 198528.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kielce, Poland
8 Nov 201760.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland
8 Nov 201760.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxita
9 Dec 201760.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxita

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Kaleta (VIAF: 162605099)
Bishop Andrzej Kaleta (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kielce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBusko-Zdrój
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Kielce, Diocese of Kielce

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kielce.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,614

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast