Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stanisław Cardinal Dziwisz

Archbishop of Kraków {Cracow}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1939 BornRaba Wyżna, Poland
25 Mar 196323.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
23 Jun 196324.2Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
7 Feb 199858.8AppointedTitular Bishop of San Leone
7 Feb 199858.8AppointedOfficial of the Prefecture of the Papal Household
19 Mar 199858.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of San Leone
29 Sep 200364.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of San Leone
3 Jun 200566.1AppointedArchbishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
27 Aug 200566.3InstalledArchbishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
24 Mar 200666.9Elevated to Cardinal
24 Mar 200666.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
24 Oct 200667.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Dziwisz:
Stanisław Cardinal Dziwisz (born ) Archbishop of Kraków {Cracow}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 50*
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,252

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 7 Oct 2014