Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Damian Andrzej Muskus, O.F.M.

Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland

Titular Bishop of Amaia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1967 Born
4 Oct 199124.0Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
12 Jun 199325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
16 Jul 201143.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
16 Jul 201143.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Amaia
28 Sep 201144.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amaia

MicroData Summary for Damian Andrzej Muskus
Bishop Damian Andrzej Muskus O.F.M. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kraków {Cracow}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNowa Sarzyna

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Kraków {Cracow}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2011
  • ob: CB, 16 Jul 2011
  • c34: CB, 16 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,151

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast